EP2236875 - Fluid flow control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARK IV SYSTEMES MOTEURS (SAS) 53 rue Baudin 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Nicolas 130 Avenue d'Alsace 68000 Colmar / FR | 02 /
Floranc, Alexandre "Au Moulin" 68127 Sainte Croix en Plaine / FR | 03 /
Cottet, François Lieu-dit le Kalblin 68240 Freland / FR | 04 /
Guyon, David 5 rue Jean-Baptiste Salomon 68040 Ingersheim / FR | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Becker, Nicolas 130 Avenue d'Alsace 68000 Colmar / FR | ||
02 /
Floranc, Alexandre "Au Moulin" 68127 Sainte Croix en Plaine / FR | |||
03 /
Cottet, François Lieu-dit le Kalblin 68240 Freland / FR | |||
04 /
Guyon, David Rue Jean-Baptiste Salomon 68040 Ingersheim / FR | Representative(s) | Nuss, Laurent, et al Laurent Nuss Conseil 12, rue Theophile Schuler 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Nuss, Laurent, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305325.2 | 30.03.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | FR20090052217 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: FR 0952217 | [2010/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236875 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/12, F16K41/10 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F16K41/103 (EP,US);
F16K7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fluidstromregelvorrichtung | [2010/40] | English: | Fluid flow control device | [2010/40] | French: | Dispositif de controle de la circulation d'un fluide | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/45] | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102006058507 (SCHELL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032]; figure - * [Y] 3,8,9,12; | [Y]GB1198075 (PARAGON PLASTICS LTD) [Y] 3 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2008099081 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2906335 (MARK IV SYSTEMES MOTEURS SOC P [FR]) [Y] 12 * page 1; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2008228 (CONCORDIA FLUIDTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * page 1, line 110 - page 2, line 76; figure - * |