EP2392648 - Methods for obtaining stem cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Pasteur 28, Rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chretien, Fabrice 21 rue de Lisbonne 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Latil, Mathilde 5 bis rue des Ailantes 94100 Saint-Maur-des-Fosses / FR | 03 /
Tajbakhsh, Shahragim 135 rue du Théatre 75015 Paris / FR | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10305603.2 | 04.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392648 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/074, C12N5/0789, C12N5/0797 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
A01N1/0284 (EP,US);
A01N1/021 (EP,US);
A61K35/14 (US);
A61K35/28 (US);
A61K35/34 (US);
C12N5/0623 (US);
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
C12N5/0659 (EP,US);
C12N5/0668 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhalt von Stammzellen | [2011/49] | English: | Methods for obtaining stem cells | [2011/49] | French: | Procédés d'obtention de cellules souches | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 07.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MOSHKIN S A ET AL, "FORMATION DYNAMICS OF FIBROBLAST-LIKE CELLS IN THE MONO LAYER CULTURE OF CADAVERIC POST MORTEM BONE MARROW", PROBLEMY GEMATOLOGII I PERELIVANIA KROVI, MEDICINA, MOSCOW, RU, (19760101), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0552-2080, pages 39 - 42, XP009137799 [X] 1-6,18 * abstract * | [X] - LIU P I ET AL, "PROLIFERATIVE FUNCTION OF CADAVERIC BONE MARROW CELLS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19780101), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0361-8609, pages 145 - 150, XP009137798 [X] 3-6,18 * the whole document * | [X] - SÖDERDAHL G ET AL, "Cadaveric bone marrow and spleen cells for transplantation", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (19980101), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 0268-3369, pages 79 - 84, XP009137111 [X] 3-6,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bmt.1701039 | [X] - MARLICZ W ET AL, "Isolation of hematopoietic stem cells from heparinized cadaveric multiple organ donors: Potential clinical implications", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (199908), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0041-1345, pages 2099 - 2101, XP002598977 [X] 3-6,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0041-1345(99)00275-4 | [X] - D'IPPOLITO G ET AL, "Marrow-isolated adult multilineage inducible (MIAMI) cells, a unique population of postnatal young and old human cells with extensive expansion and differentiation potential", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1242/JCS.01103, (20040615), vol. 117, no. part 14, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 2971 - 2981, XP002339338 [X] 3-6,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.01103 | [X] - AHRENS NORBERT ET AL, "Mesenchymal stem cell content of human vertebral bone marrow", TRANSPLANTATION, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE US, (20040927), vol. 78, no. 6, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 925 - 929, XP009137115 [X] 3-6,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.TP.0000133305.81823.2A | [A] - ERKER L., AZUMA H., LEE A.Y., GUO C., ET AL., "Therapeutic liver reconstitution with murine cells isolated long after death", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (20100602), vol. 139, doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2010.05.082, pages 1019 - 1029, XP002598978 [A] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2010.05.082 | [X] - CIPOLLESCHI M G ET AL, "The role of hypoxia in the maintenance of hematopoietic stem cells", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (19931001), vol. 82, no. 7, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2031 - 2037, XP007908065 [X] 9-13,17,18 * the whole document * | [X] - FOLLMAR K E ET AL, "Effects of glutamine, glucose, and oxygen concentration on the metabolism and proliferation of rabbit adipose-derived stem cells", TISSUE ENGINEERING, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20061218), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1089/TEN.2006.12.3525, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 3525 - 3533, XP002602213 [X] 9-13,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/TEN.2006.12.3525 | [X] - RASTOGI S ET AL, "Effects of intravenous injections of hypoxia-conditioned bone marrow-derived stem cell medium in dogs with heart failure", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HEART FAILURE SUPPLEMENTS, ELSEVIER, vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S1567-4215(08)60316-1, ISSN 1567-4215, (20080601), page 114, (20080601), XP025768719 [X] 9-13,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1567-4215(08)60316-1 | [X] - HERMITTE FRANCIS ET AL, "Very low O-2 concentration (0.1%) favors G(0) return of dividing CD34(+) cells", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (200601), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 65 - 73, XP002615117 [X] 18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/STEMCELLS.2004-0351 | [X] - JIN Y ET AL, "Mesenchymal stem cells cultured under hypoxia escape from senescence via down-regulation of p16 and extracellular signal regulated kinase", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 391, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, (20100115), pages 1471 - 1476, (20100114), XP026854472 [X] 18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.12.096 | [A] - IVANOVIC ZORAN, "Hypoxia or In Situ Normoxia: The Stem Cell Paradigm", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (200905), vol. 219, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 271 - 275, XP002615118 [A] 9-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JCP.21690 | Examination | - LAYWELL E.D. ET AL, "Multipotent neurospheres can be derived from forebrain subependymal zone and spinal cord of adult mice after protracted postmortem intervals", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990401), vol. 156, no. 2, doi:10.1006/EXNR.1999.7029, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 430 - 433, XP002188129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.1999.7029 | - C. Dromard ET AL, "Adult human spinal cord harbors neural precursor cells that generate neurons and glial cells in vitro -", J. Neurosci. Res., (20080311), pages 1916 - 1926, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/jnr.21646/abstract, (20150325), XP055179268 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.21646 | - Yi Xu ET AL, "Isolation of neural stem cells from the forebrain of deceased early postnatal and adult rats with protracted post-mortem intervals", Journal of Neuroscience Research, (20031115), vol. 74, no. 4, doi:10.1002/jnr.10769, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 533 - 540, XP055179270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.10769 | by applicant | WO0153462 | - THOMSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, no. 5891, pages 1145 - 1147 | - YI XU ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 74, pages 533 - 540 | - XINCHUN LIU, JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, (2006), vol. 157, pages 64 - 70 | - PALMER ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 42 - 43 | - BURGERS ET AL., EXP. BRAIN RES., (2008), vol. 188, no. 1, pages 33 - 43 | - YI XU, JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 74, pages 533 - 540 | - CHAZAUD ET AL., EXP. CELL. RES., (2000), vol. 258, no. 2, pages 237 - 44 | - ARNOLD L ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2007), vol. 204, no. 5, pages 1057 - 69 | - FRIEDENSTEIN AJ, CALCI TISSUE INT, (1995), vol. 56, page 17 | - BERNARDO ME, J. CELL. PHYSIOL., (2007), vol. 211, pages 121 - 130 | - JOURNAL OFFICIEL DES COMMUNAUTES EUROP6ENNES, (19861218), vol. L358 | - SAMBASIVAN R, DEV CELL., (200906), vol. L 6, no. 6, pages 810 - 21 | - OKABE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (19970505), vol. 407, no. 3, pages 313 - 9 | - CHAZAUD B ET AL., EXP CELL RES., (2000), vol. 258, pages 237 - 44 | - SAMBASIVAN R, DEV CELL., (200906), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 810 - 21 | - SHININ V ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL., (200607), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 677 - 687 | - WHITE RB ET AL., BMC DEV BIOL., (2010), vol. 22, no. 10, page 21 |