EP2398277 - Self-configuration of donor/relay eNode B interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godin, Philippe 150 Avenue du General Leclerc Batiment A 78220 Viroflay / FR | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Intellectual Property and Standards Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | Application number, filing date | 10305644.6 | 16.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398277 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398277 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W24/02, H04W92/10, H04W88/04 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W92/10 (KR);
H04W8/24 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Selbstkonfiguration einer donor/relay eNode B Schnitstelle | [2012/36] | English: | Self-configuration of donor/relay eNode B interface | [2011/51] | French: | Auto-configuration de l'interface donor/relais eNode B | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/51] | Selbstkonfigurierung einer donor/relay eNode B Schnitstelle | Examination procedure | 15.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 13.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 26.12.2012 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | SM | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | IE | 16.06.2013 | LU | 16.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.12.2012 | ||
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
LU | 16.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009120127 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]US2009247159 (FLORE ORONZO [IT], et al); |