EP2399946 - Coated parts and their application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Krause, Jens / 8, Impasse des Jonquilles 26540, Mours-Saint -Eusèbe / FR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Portal, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Portal, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305677.6 | 24.06.2010 | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399946 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/40, C08G18/48, C08G18/58, C08G18/66, C08G18/79, E21B36/00, C09D175/04 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C08G18/4816 (EP,US);
C09D5/1662 (US);
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C09D175/08 (EP,US);
C08G2150/90 (EP,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beschichtete Teile und deren Verwendung | [2011/52] | English: | Coated parts and their application | [2011/52] | French: | Pièces revêtues et leur utilisation | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101457018 ; | [Y]EP0512198 (RHEOX INT [US]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 47 - line 50 *; | [Y]EP1375577 (BAYER AG [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-5,17; table 2 *; | [Y]WO2009141080 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2010003788 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1* page 5, line 18 - line 31; claims 1-4; table 1 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 47, Database accession no. 2009-K83402, XP002601276 & CN101457018 A 20090617 (YANTAI WANHUA NEW MATERIAL SCI&TECHNOL) [Y] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2005058996 |