EP2281432 - Machine for harvesting pollen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stallergenes S.A. 6, rue Alexis de Tocqueville 92183 Antony Cedex / FR | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafargue, Marianne 114 rue d'Aboukir 75002, Paris / FR | 02 /
Nicolas, Vincent 19 avenue Jacques Jezequel 92170, Vanves / FR | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Lafargue, Marianne 114 rue d'Aboukir 75002, Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Nicolas, Vincent 19 avenue Jacques Jezequel 92170, Vanves / FR | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/06] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305815.2 | 22.07.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | FR20090055410 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0955410 | US20090231495P | 05.08.2009 Original published format: US 231495 P | [2011/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2281432 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281432 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01D45/00, A01D46/00 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
A01D46/005 (EP,US);
A01D45/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Ernten von Pollen | [2011/06] | English: | Machine for harvesting pollen | [2011/06] | French: | Machine à récolter du pollen | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 27.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2010 | AL | 20.02.2013 | AT | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | SM | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | IE | 22.07.2013 | LU | 22.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006053686 (HALWAS GARRY W [CA]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3407517 (PARASKEVAS MELIDIS DIPL ING, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |