EP2279897 - Method for managing the kinematics of a seat with moving parts by space of freedom and seat implementing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precilec 41-47 rue Guynemer 89000 Auxerre / FR | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoreux, Loic 6 boulevard Georges Clémenceau 92400, Courbevoie / FR | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/05] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305839.2 | 29.07.2010 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | FR20090055414 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0955414 | [2011/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2279897 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2279897 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60N2/24, B60N2/44, B64D11/06 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
B64D11/064 (EP,US);
B60N2/0244 (EP,US);
B60N2/24 (EP,US);
B60N2/995 (EP,US);
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/06395 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | Steuerverfahren der Kinematik eines Sitzes mit beweglichen Teilen gemäß des Freiraums, und Sitz, bei dem dieses Verfahren umgesetzt wird | [2011/05] | English: | Method for managing the kinematics of a seat with moving parts by space of freedom and seat implementing the same | [2011/05] | French: | Procédé de gestion de la cinématique d'un siège à parties mobiles par espace de liberté et siège le mettant en oeuvre | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2010 | AL | 26.09.2012 | AT | 26.09.2012 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | HR | 26.09.2012 | IT | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | MC | 26.09.2012 | MK | 26.09.2012 | MT | 26.09.2012 | NL | 26.09.2012 | PL | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | SM | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | NO | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | ES | 06.01.2013 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 29.07.2010 | |
AT | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
MK | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
SM | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
MK | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
SM | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
SM | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
NL | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
HR | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
NO | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | |
NO | 26.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2801480 (LABINAL [FR]); | [A]FR2821252 (LABINAL [FR]); | [A]DE102006027994 (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE]) |