EP2420380 - Non-combustible composite panel and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa Architectural Products SAS 1, Rue du Ballon 68500 Merxheim / FR | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koenig, Bertrand 40 rue Jean Jaures 67300, SCHILTIGHEIM / FR | 02 /
Correa, Eberhard Goethestrasse 3 79100, FREIBURG / DE | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305901.0 | 19.08.2010 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420380 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B13/04, B32B13/08, B32B15/04, B32B15/08, B32B27/06, C01F5/14, C04B14/30, C04B26/02, C08K3/22, C09K21/02 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B32B13/04 (EP,US);
B32B13/02 (US);
B28B19/0092 (EP,US);
B32B13/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (EP,US);
B32B27/065 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B3/10 (US);
B32B5/00 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
C09K21/02 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B14/24, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B20/0096, C04B24/2611, C04B24/34, C04B40/0259, C04B40/0263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nicht brennbares Verbundpaneel und Herstellungsverfahren | [2012/08] | English: | Non-combustible composite panel and manufacturing method | [2012/08] | French: | Panneau composite non combustible et procédé de fabrication | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4317315 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1-9* claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0616985 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5507894 (EHRAT RAINER [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-9 * |