EP2422648 - Office device with multiple spatial configurations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEELCASE SA 1, Allée d'Oslo Espace Européen de l'Entreprise 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reithler, Christophe 15, rue de l'Arc en ciel F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Bureaux Europe 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305912.7 | 24.08.2010 | [2012/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422648 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47B17/03, A47B46/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A47B17/03 (EP,US);
A47B21/03 (US);
A47B17/065 (EP,US);
A47B46/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bürovorrichtung mit mehreren räumlichen Konfigurationsmöglichkeiten | [2012/09] | English: | Office device with multiple spatial configurations | [2012/09] | French: | Dispositif pour bureau à multiples configurations spatiales | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1151639 (MAUSER KG) [A] 1 * figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US6206495 (PETERSON GRAHAM [US]) [X] 1,4-6,13 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2006284529 (MILUTINOVICS DEZSOE [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US6145448 |