EP2434059 - A reinforced soil structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERRE ARMEE INTERNATIONALE 280 avenue Napoléon Bonaparte 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Terre Armée Internationale 1 bis Rue du Petit Clamart 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitag, Nicolas 1 bis, rue Racine 91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
Lucas, Eric TERRE ARMEE INTERNATIONALE 1Bis rue du Petit Clamart 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/13] | 01 /
Freitag, Nicolas 1 bis, rue Racine 91400 Orsay / FR | ||
02 /
Lucas, Eric TERRE ARMEE INTERNATIONALE 1Bis rue du Petit Clama 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/13] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10306033.1 | 24.09.2010 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2434059 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2434059 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
E02D29/0241 (EP,US);
E02D29/0225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2012/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verstärkte Bodenstruktur | [2012/13] | English: | A reinforced soil structure | [2012/13] | French: | Structure de sol renforcée | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 23.12.2015 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | IE | 24.09.2016 | LU | 24.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 24.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 24.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 24.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 24.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
IE | 24.09.2016 | ||
LU | 24.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2939157 (TERRE ARMEE INT [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 7 - page 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10311597 (HUESKER SYNTHETIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2922234 (TERRE ARMEE INTERNATIONALE SOC [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0603460 (RDB PLASTOTECNICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1114896 |