EP2383572 - Cellular humoral activation test (CHAT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assistance Publique Hôpitaux de Marseille (APHM) 80, Rue Brochier 13354 Marseille Cedex 5 / FR | For all designated states Université de la Méditerranée (Aix-Marseille II) Jardin du Pharo 58, boulevard Charles Livon 13284 Marseille Cédex 07 / FR | For all designated states Etablissement Français du Sang (EFS) 6 rue Alexandre Cabanel 75015 Paris / FR | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Pascale 1 passage Girard 13007 Marseille / FR | 02 /
Picard, Christophe 11 bd Madeleine Remusat 13013 Marseille / FR | 03 /
Legris, Tristan 187 rue Saint-Pierre 13007 Marseille / FR | 04 /
Dignat-George, Françoise 305 rue Paradis 13008 Marseille / FR | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Barbot, Willy Simodoro-ip 82, rue Sylvabelle 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Barbot, Willy SIMODORO Parc Cézanne II, Bât. G 290 Avenue Galilée 13857 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10358003.1 | 28.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383572 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/564, G01N33/566 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/5047 (EP);
G01N2333/70535 (EP);
G01N2333/7158 (EP);
G01N2800/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Test auf zelluläre humorale Aktivierung | [2011/44] | English: | Cellular humoral activation test (CHAT) | [2011/44] | French: | Test de l'activité humorale cellulaire (CHAT) | [2011/44] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2011/44: If details are not fully discernible,this is due to the quality of the drawings filed.The clearness of the drawings is the applicant's responsibility. | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03035904 (CHRU TOURS [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - VACHER-COPONAT HENRI ET AL, "Natural killer cell alterations correlate with loss of renal function and dialysis duration in uraemic patients.", NEPHROLOGY, DIALYSIS, TRANSPLANTATION : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE EUROPEAN DIALYSIS AND TRANSPLANT ASSOCIATION - EUROPEAN RENAL ASSOCIATION APR 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18029366, (200804), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 1460-2385, pages 1406 - 1414, XP002605894 [X] 1-12 * page 1406, column 2, lines 18-28 * * page 1407, column 1, lines 1-5 * * page 1407, column 2, line 34 * * page 1407, column 2, line 37 * * page 1407, column 2, line 56 - page 1408, column 1, line 14 * * page 1409, column 2, lines 23-27 * * page 1409, column 2, lines 57-61; figure 3; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NDT/GFM596 | [X] - UMEHARA H ET AL, "Fractalkine and vascular injury", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02051-8, (20011101), vol. 22, no. 11, ISSN 1471-4906, pages 602 - 607, XP004319768 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 602, column 2, lines 33-38 * * page 603, column 2, line 55 - page 604, column 1, line 3 * * page 604, column 1, lines 31-38 * * page 604, column 2, lines 1-4 * * page 604, column 2, lines 10-22 * * page 605, column 1, lines 51-55 * * page 606, column 1, lines 10-18 * * page 606, column 2, lines 48-52 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4906(01)02051-8 | [Y] - HISANORI UMEHARA ET AL, "Fractalkine in rheumatoid arthritis and allied conditions", MODERN RHEUMATOLOGY ; OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, TO LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S10165-006-0471-9, (20060601), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 1439-7609, pages 124 - 130, XP019387365 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10165-006-0471-9 | [Y] - CORNELL L D ET AL, "Kidney transplantation: Mechanisms of rejection and acceptance", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PATHOLOGY: MECHANISMS OF DISEASE, ANNUAL REVIEWS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1146/ANNUREV.PATHMECHDIS.3.121806.151508, vol. 3, ISSN 1553-4006, (20080201), pages 189 - 220, (20070912), XP008123514 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/ANNUREV.PATHMECHDIS.3.121806.151508 | [A] - AL-MASSARANI G ET AL, "Kidney transplantation decreases the level and procoagulant activity of circulating microparticles.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TRANSPLANTATION : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF TRANSPLANTATION AND THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF TRANSPLANT SURGEONS MAR 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19260834, (200903), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1600-6143, pages 550 - 557, XP002605895 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1600-6143.2008.02532.X | [A] - LEA RICHARD G ET AL, "Immunoendocrine aspects of endometrial function and implantation.", REPRODUCTION (CAMBRIDGE, ENGLAND) SEP 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17709558, (200709), vol. 134, no. 3, ISSN 1470-1626, pages 389 - 404, XP002605896 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/REP-07-0167 | by applicant | US4683202 | US5854033 | - D'HAESE, EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC TARGETS., (2010), vol. 14, pages 207 - 219 | - DAMAS, ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY., (2005), vol. 25, pages 2567 - 2572 | - UMEHARA, ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 24, pages 34 - 40 | - BJERKELI, RHEUMATOLOGY, (2007), vol. 46, pages 1422 - 1427 | - STEPANIAN ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E6192 | - BARANY, PROC. NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - GUATELLI, PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - KWOH, PROC. NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - LIZARDI, BIOL. TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 |