EP2360408 - Security splicing system of aligned pipes, against the expansion and/or contraction thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pires Cabado, Elisabet Patricia Cedres 6 08328 Alella Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Pires Cabado, Bárbara Inés Cedres, 6 08328 Alella Barcelona / ES | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Espiell Volart, Eduardo Maria R.VOLART PONS Y CIA, S.L. 77 Pau Claris 08010 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Espiell Volart, Eduardo Maria R.VOLART PONS Y CIA, S.L. 77 Pau Claris 08010 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2011/34] | Espiell Volart, Eduardo Maria R.VOLART PONS Y CIA, S.L. 77 Pau Claris 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 10380126.2 | 08.10.2010 | [2011/34] | Priority number, date | ES20100030197 | 12.02.2010 Original published format: ES 201030197 | [2011/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360408 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2360408 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/024, F16L25/12, F16L47/14 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
F16L25/12 (EP,ES);
F16L23/02 (ES);
F16L23/024 (EP);
F16L47/14 (EP,ES);
F16L51/00 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsspleißsystem für ausgerichtete Rohre gegen Ausdehnung bzw. Zusammenziehung vorgenommene Verbesserungen | [2014/12] | English: | Security splicing system of aligned pipes, against the expansion and/or contraction thereof | [2011/34] | French: | Système sécurisé de jonction de tuyaux alignés protégés contre l'expansion et/ou la contraction | [2014/12] |
Former [2011/34] | Sicherheitsspleißsystem für ausgerichtete Rohre gegen Ausdehnung bzw. Zusammenziehung vorgenommene Verbesserungen | ||
Former [2011/34] | Système sécurisé de jointage de tuyaux alignés protégés contre l'expansion et/ou la contraction | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2010 | AL | 05.03.2014 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MK | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | RS | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | SM | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | NO | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | GB | 08.10.2014 | IE | 08.10.2014 | LU | 08.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.10.2010 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MK | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.10.2010 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.10.2010 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
GB | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | |
NO | 05.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4679830 (KOK FRANS J J A [NL]); | [A]US5100183 (MONTESI ROBERT P [US], et al); | [A]US5779285 (ROBISON DAVE [US]); | [A]US5842726 (HALEN JR RICHARD M [US]); | [Y]EP2101099 (PIRES CABADO ELISABET PATRICIA [ES], et al) |