EP2426111 - 4-[-2-[[5-methyl-1-(2-naphtalenyl)-1h-pyrazol-3-yl]oxy]ethyl]morpholine hydrochloride amorphous solid forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Laboratorios del. Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda. Mare de Déu de Montserrat 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benet Buchholz, Jordi Plaza Romani 3 Casa A E-43893 Altafulla - (Tarragona) / ES | 02 /
Puig Fernandez, Laura C/ El maquinista de la General, 37 2A E-50019 Zaragoza / ES | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10382225.0 | 09.08.2010 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426111 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/22, A61P25/16, A61P25/00, A61K31/4152 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
C07D231/22 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Feste 4-[-2-[[5-Methyl-1-(2-naphthalenyl)-1h-pyrazol-3-yl]oxy]ethyl]morpholinhydrochlorid-Formen | [2012/10] | English: | 4-[-2-[[5-methyl-1-(2-naphtalenyl)-1h-pyrazol-3-yl]oxy]ethyl]morpholine hydrochloride amorphous solid forms | [2012/10] | French: | Formes cristallines de chlorhydrate de 4-[-2-[[5-méthyl-1-(2-naphtalényl)-1h-pyrazol-3-yl]oxy]éthyl]morpholine | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2008125416 (LAGGNER CHRISTIAN [AT], et al) [AD] 1-10 * example 61 *; | WO2006021462 [ ] (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al); | [A]EP2116539 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006021462 | WO9741114 | - WALKER, J.M. ET AL., PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 42, page 355 | - SNYDER, S.H.; LARGENT, B.L., J. NEUROPSYCHIATRY, (1989), vol. 1, page 7 | - QUIRION, R. ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1992), vol. 13, pages 85 - 86 | - HANNER, M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 93, pages 8072 - 8077 | - M. LANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 14834 | - C. PRICE ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, page 5512 | EP20100382025 |