EP2208410 - Distributor head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilken, Martin Poggenfehner Strasse 17 26409 Wittmund / DE | [2010/29] | Application number, filing date | 10401004.6 | 13.01.2010 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | DE20091005072 | 19.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009005072 | [2010/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208410 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/08 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
A01C7/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verteilerkopf | [2010/29] | English: | Distributor head | [2010/29] | French: | Tête de répartition | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 12.03.2011 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 07.04.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0061335 (BALMER CHARLES) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - line 21 * * page 5, line 5 - line 23 * * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE1557913 (KIDD LTD ARCHIE) [Y] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US5018668 (BAUER NORMAN A [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 6, line 36 - line 48 * * figure - *; | [AD]DE19522060 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * abstract * * figure -; claim - * |