01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
17.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
22.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
21.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
21.12.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
26.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |