Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2278227 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | EP2278227 | 23.01.2013 | A3 | EP2278227 | 26.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009033404 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009033404 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009033404 | 15.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201909782T | 22.07.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | DE102009033404 | 15.07.2009 |