EP2409619 - Vacuum cleaner with lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerth, Volker Vilsendorfer Strasse 30a 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Andrup, Klemens Teutoburger Strasse 76 33415 Verl / DE | 03 /
Roth, Martin Detmolder Strasse 70 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
Hanschur, Mark Herforder Strasse 76 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 10401110.1 | 20.07.2010 | [2012/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409619 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/36, A47L9/30, // A47L9/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A47L9/0027 (EP);
A47L9/2842 (EP);
A47L9/2857 (EP);
A47L9/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Staubsauger mit Beleuchtungseinrichtung | [2012/04] | English: | Vacuum cleaner with lighting device | [2012/04] | French: | Aspirateur doté d'un dispositif d'éclairage | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5560076 (LEUNG SING K [HK]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [I] 2,3; | [XI]GB2317817 (NOTETRY LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 8, line 6 - line 22 * * figure 2 * [I] 2,3; | [IA]US2004163200 (OVERVAAG CHAD D [US], et al) [I] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 5 |