EP2345354 - Dispensing device for dispensing coffee and/or milk and/or milk foam, beverage making machine with a dispensing device and method for assembling a dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JURA Elektroapparate AG Kaffeeweltstrasse 10 4626 Niederbuchsiten / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Jura Elektroapparate AG Kaffeeweltstrasse 10 4626 Niederbuchsiten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullmann, Erich Hofmattstrasse 5 4622 Egerkingen / CH | 02 /
Büttiker, Philipp Obere Bündten 302 4625 Oberbuchsiten / CH | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/29] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10405010.9 | 19.01.2010 | [2011/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345354 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2345354 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345354 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/46 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP,US);
A47J31/4403 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung zur Abgabe von Kaffee und/oder Milch und/oder Milchschaum, Getränkebereitungsmaschine mit einer Abgabevorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zusammensetzen einer Abgabevorrichtung | [2011/29] | English: | Dispensing device for dispensing coffee and/or milk and/or milk foam, beverage making machine with a dispensing device and method for assembling a dispensing device | [2011/29] | French: | Dispositif de distribution destiné à distribuer du café et/ou du lait et/ou de la mousse de lait, machine de préparation de boissons dotée d'un dispositif de distribution et procédé d'assemblage d'un dispositif de distribution | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 07.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | CY | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MK | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SM | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | IE | 19.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MK | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SM | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SM | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 11.07.2012 | |
NO | 11.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH685597 (THERMOPLAN AG) [AD] 1* figure 1 * | by applicant | CH685597 | DE102006043903 |