EP2353823 - Positioning device for adjustable elements, method for positioning adjustable elements and use of positioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freymatic AG beim Bahnhof 7012 Felsberg / CH | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manzanell, Marco Via Padrusa 18 7013 Domat Ems / CH | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/32] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10405021.6 | 08.02.2010 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2353823 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2353823 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/16, B28B17/00, B26D1/52, B26D7/26 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
B28B17/00 (EP);
B26D1/553 (EP);
B26D7/0006 (EP);
B26D7/26 (EP);
B28B11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | Positioniervorrichtung für verstellbare Elemente, Verfahren zum Positionieren von verstellbaren Elementen und Verwendung einer Positioniervorrichtung | [2011/32] | English: | Positioning device for adjustable elements, method for positioning adjustable elements and use of positioning device | [2011/32] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement pour éléments réglables, procédé de positionnement d'éléments réglables et utilisation d'un dispositif de positionnement | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 11.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 15.06.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 31.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2010 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | IE | 08.02.2014 | LU | 08.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | GB | 08.04.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.02.2010 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.02.2010 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 08.04.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 08.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1889703 (FABCON INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012]; figure -; claims 6-10 *; | [XI]US4163185 (TOKUNO MASATERU [JP]) [X] 1,3-9,21 * column 1, line 10 - line 40 * * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 17; figure - * [I] 16-20; | [X]EP1647377 (JURMET SP Z O O [PL]) [X] 16-20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019]; figure - *; | [A]DE19934391 (PLASTTECHNIK ENGINEERING GREIZ [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 26; figure - * |