EP2368643 - Powder coating assembly for coating workpieces with powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Wagner AG Industriestrasse 22 9450 Altstätten / CH | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleijn, Han Jaspisdreef 1 7828 CG Emmen / NL | 02 /
Brandsema, Wim Menso Altingstraat 15 7841 CA Sleen / NL | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Nückel, Thomas Patentanwaltskanzlei Nückel Eichweidstrasse 22 8820 Wädensvil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Nückel, Thomas Weinberglistrasse 4 6005 Luzern / CH | Application number, filing date | 10405044.8 | 09.03.2010 | [2011/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2368643 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12, // B05B7/14 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
B05B7/1454 (EP);
B05B13/0473 (EP);
B05B14/45 (EP);
B05B14/48 (EP);
B05B7/1477 (EP);
B05B12/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pulverbeschichtungsanlage zum Beschichten von Werkstücken mit Pulver | [2011/39] | English: | Powder coating assembly for coating workpieces with powder | [2011/39] | French: | Installation de revêtement par poudre destinée à recouvrir des pièces usinées avec de la poudre | [2011/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4245551 (BERKMANN ADOLF [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 39; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-4,6,8,12-14; | [A]DE19644360 (PBS PULVERBESCHICHTUNGS UND SP [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 31 - line 68; figures 1-4 *; | [YD]EP1256386 (WAGNER J AG [CH]) [YD] 3,4,13 * column 3, paragraph 14 - column 5, paragraph 23; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2058055 (WAGNER J AG [CH]) [Y] 2,12,14 * column 2, paragraph 7 - column 4, paragraph 31; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP2098303 (WAGNER J AG [CH]) [Y] 3,4,6,8 * column 1, paragraph 6 - column 3, paragraph 20; figures 1-2 * * column 6, paragraph 37 * | Examination | DE102007005306 | by applicant | EP1256386 | EP1007222 |