EP2366920 - Sealing system for industrial gate valves and gate valve comprising such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gasket International S.p.A. Via B. Colleoni, 5/C 24060 Cividino di Castelli, Calepio / IT | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scattini, Roberto Via Cadorna, 25 24060 Credaro / IT | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10425057.6 | 05.03.2010 | [2011/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2366920 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2366920 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/02 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
F16K3/0227 (EP);
F16J15/3408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/38] | Title | German: | Dichtungssystem für industrielle Schieberventile und Schieberventil mit solch einem System | [2011/38] | English: | Sealing system for industrial gate valves and gate valve comprising such a system | [2011/38] | French: | Système d'étanchéité de robinets-vannes industriels et robinets-vannes le comprenant | [2011/38] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 14.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | SM | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | IE | 05.03.2013 | LU | 05.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
LU | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3765647 (GROVE M, et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - line 22 *; | [X]US5163655 (CHICKERING III KENTON [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-5 * * column 5, line 17 - line 44 *; | [A]US2007228316 (TATUM GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO2006130546 (DUPONT PERFORMANCE ELASTOMERS [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 7, line 24 - page 9, line 8 * |