EP2251282 - Scraper for a conveyor belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoessl, Peter Grüner Hang 7 4203 Altenberg / AT | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 10450083.0 | 12.05.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | AT20090000718 | 12.05.2009 Original published format: AT 7182009 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251282 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/12 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
B65G45/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abstreifer für ein Förderband | [2010/46] | English: | Scraper for a conveyor belt | [2010/46] | French: | Racleur pour une bande de transport | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/46] | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1193197 (LAW ROBERT R [AU]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012]; figures 4, 5 *; | [X]US2004188224 (KOLODZIEJ JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040]; figures 3a, 3b, 4 *; | [X]EP0947452 (KRUMSCHEID GMBH MASCHBAU [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 5 * | by applicant | EP1388506 |