EP2381996 - DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A GAS TO A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING GAS TO A PATIENT | ||
[2013/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstraße 1 80331 München / DE | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Rainer Mitterfeldgasse 4 A-2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | 02 /
ROMAKO, Christian Leharstr. 2 A-3382 Loosdorf / AT | 03 /
KÖHLE, Christian Untere Hofgärten 3/9 A-2120 Wolkersdorf im Weinviertel / AT | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 10700369.1 | 07.01.2010 | WO2010EP00048 | Priority number, date | DE20091004107 | 08.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009004107 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079134 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381996 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381996 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/12 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61M16/12 (EP,US);
A61M16/0078 (EP,US);
A61M16/22 (EP,US);
A61M2230/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSORGEN EINES PATIENTEN MIT EINEM GAS | [2011/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROVIDING A GAS TO A PATIENT | [2013/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN GAZ À UN PATIENT | [2013/23] |
Former [2011/44] | DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING GAS TO A PATIENT | ||
Former [2011/44] | DISPOSITIF POUR FOURNIR UN GAZ À UN PATIENT | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 12.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2010 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MK | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | SM | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | AT | 07.01.2015 | IE | 07.01.2015 | LU | 07.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.01.2010 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0861672 (PANINA ELENA VLADIMIROVNA [RU]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2862227 (DRAEGER MEDICAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0894506 (OHMEDA INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19639522 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004052398 (DRAEGER MEDICAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2368531 (FENTON PAUL [MW]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2894486 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9218160U (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0861672 |