EP2389295 - RUBBER MIXTURES CONTAINING SILANE AND HAVING POSSIBLY FUNCTIONALIZED DIENE RUBBERS AND MICROGELS, A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Lanxess Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINHAUSER, Norbert Grabenstrasse 21 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
OBRECHT, Werner Beethovenstrasse 4 47447 Moers / DE | 03 /
HARDY, David Rotkäppchenweg 16 41541 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
GROSS, Thomas Holunderweg 12 42489 Wülfrath / DE | [2011/48] | Application number, filing date | 10700565.4 | 19.01.2010 | WO2010EP50571 | Priority number, date | DE20091005713 | 22.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009005713 | [2011/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010084114 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2389295 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2389295 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08K5/548 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/00 (KR);
C08K5/548 (EP,KR,US);
C08L15/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/02 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L15/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L21/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L19/006 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L9/02, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L19/006 (EP,US);
C08L9/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L19/006 (EP,US);
C08L9/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILANHALTIGE KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNGEN MIT GEGEBENENFALLS FUNKTIONALISIERTEN DIENKAUTSCHUKEN UND MIKROGELEN, EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2011/48] | English: | RUBBER MIXTURES CONTAINING SILANE AND HAVING POSSIBLY FUNCTIONALIZED DIENE RUBBERS AND MICROGELS, A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF | [2011/48] | French: | MÉLANGES DE CAOUTCHOUCS CONTENANT DU SILANE, PRÉSENTANT ÉVENTUELLEMENT DES CAOUTCHOUCS DIÉNIQUES FONCTIONNALISÉS ET DES MICROGELS, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 05.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | IE | 19.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1285926 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [I] 1-2,8-9 * paragraph [0054]; examples 10,11; table 2 *; | [Y]DE102007020451 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3-6* examples 1-7 *; | [XY] - NIEDERMEIER W. ; SCHWAIGER B., "Performance enhancement in rubber by modern filler systems", KGK. KAUTSCHUK, GUMMI, KUNSTSTOFFE, (20070401), vol. 60, no. 4, ISSN 0948-3276, pages 184 - 187, XP002574550 [X] 1,7,9-10 * abstract * [Y] 3-6 | Examination | WO0231040 | EP1559586 | WO2008142897 | by applicant | GB1078400 | EP0334042 | EP0405216 | EP0447066 | US5227425 | DE4220563 | EP1000971 | EP1285926 | EP1307504 | EP1559586 | US2005256284 | WO2007068555 | EP1935926 | DE102007020451 | DE102008023885 | DE102008052116 | - I. FRANTA, Elastomers and Rubber Compounding Materials, ELESEVIER, (1989), pages 88 - 92 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der organischen Chemie, 4. Auflage, vol. 14/2, page 848 |