EP2387320 - EXPANDED FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carritech Research Limited C/O Flannigan Edmonds Bannon Peal Assurance House 2 Donegall Square East Belfast BT1 5HB / GB | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Horton, Richard 6 Osborne Drive Belfast, Antrim BT9 6LG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horton, Richard 6 Osborne Drive Belfast, BT9 6LG / GB | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2011/47] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane GB-London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10700595.1 | 14.01.2010 | WO2010GB50048 | Priority number, date | GB20090000551 | 14.01.2009 Original published format: GB 0900551 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010082053 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2387320 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2387320 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00, A23L1/00, A23L1/164, A23L1/305, A23L1/308, A21D2/18, A21D2/26, A21D2/36, A23P1/14, A21D6/00, A21D8/02 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
A21D13/045 (EP);
A21D13/40 (EP,KR,US);
A23K20/00 (GB);
A61K31/167 (US);
A21D13/00 (GB);
A21D13/02 (EP);
A21D13/04 (EP);
A21D13/047 (EP);
A21D13/24 (EP);
A21D2/181 (EP,KR,US);
A21D2/188 (GB);
A21D2/263 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A21D2/36 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A21D6/00 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A21D8/02 (GB);
A21D8/025 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/19 (GB);
A23L33/21 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/24 (GB);
A23L7/117 (EP,GB,US);
A23P30/32 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A23P30/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/202 (US);
A61K31/375 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFGEBLÄHTES LEBENSMITTELPRODUKT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/47] | English: | EXPANDED FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS OF PREPARATION | [2011/47] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE EXPANSE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13191835.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 06.11.2013 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2010 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | LU | 14.01.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.01.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | HR | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US3650769 (FRITZBERG EDWARD L); | [X]GB1495194 (AVEBE COOP VERKOOP PROD AARDAP); | [A]WO8606256 (SCHAAF HEINZ NAHRUNGSMITTEL [DE]); | [A]EP0316145 (ROWNTREE SUN PAT LTD [GB]); | [XD]US5523106 (GIMMLER NORBERT [US], et al); | [X]WO9922607 (GEN MILLS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0078163 (GEN MILLS INC [US], et al); | [XD]WO02062153 (MARS INC [US]); | [X]US2006019009 (KELLER LEWIS C [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009076131 (SOLAE LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3650769 | JPS60160845 | US5523106 | WO9734503 | FR2750015 | WO0200201 | WO0237979 | EP1245158 | US6607774 | WO2007125291 | US2008020098 |