Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
29.08.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.03.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.01.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.11.2013 | Change - representative | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
18.01.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.09.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
09.09.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.07.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.03.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.02.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |