EP2373614 - AMMOXIMATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Southampton Centre for Enterprise & Innovation Building 27 Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states University of Southhampton Centre for Enterprise & Innovation Building 27 Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJA, Robert 28 Damson Crescent Fair Oak Eastleigh Hampshire SO50 8RF / GB | 02 /
PATERSON, Alexander, James Gartlochbank Coupar Angus Perth PH13 9EE / GB | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/41] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10700885.6 | 06.01.2010 | WO2010GB00010 | Priority number, date | GB20090000198 | 07.01.2009 Original published format: GB 0900198 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079324 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373614 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C249/04, C07C249/08, B01J29/84, C07C251/44, C01B37/06, C07D223/10 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C07C249/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J27/1853 (US);
B01J27/187 (US);
B01J29/84 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
C01B37/065 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C249/04, C07C251/44 (EP,US);
C07C249/08, C07C251/44 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AMMOXIMATIONSVERFAHREN | [2011/41] | English: | AMMOXIMATION PROCESS | [2011/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMMOXIMATION | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ADP]WO2009004342 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [ADP] 1,17* claims 3,6 *; | [A] - THOMAS, JOHN MEURIG ET AL, "Design of a "green" one-step catalytic production of .epsilon.-caprolactam (precursor of nylon-6)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, 102(39), 13732 -13736 CODEN: PNASA6; ISSN: 0027-8424, (2005), XP002574721 [A] 1,17 * page 13733, column 2 * * page 13735; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0506907102 | [AD] - RAJA R ET AL, "Bifunctional Molecular Sieve Catalysts for the benign ammoximation of cyclohexanone: one-step, solvent-free production of oxime and caprolactam with a mixture of air and ammonia", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, USA, (20010101), vol. 123, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8153 - 8154, XP002272739 [AD] 1,17 * page 8153, column 2, line 4 - line 29 * * page 8154; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja011001+ | [A] - JIHONG YU ET AL, "Rich structre chemistry in the aluminophosphate family", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20030101), vol. 36, no. 7, ISSN 0001-4842, pages 481 - 490, XP002504233 [A] 1,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AR0201557 | by applicant | US4567029 | - J. M. THOMAS; R. RAJA, "Design of a "green" one-step catalytic production of s-caprolactam (precursor of nylon-6)", PROCEEDINGS NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.0506907102, pages 13732 - 13736, XP002574721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0506907102 | - R. RAJA; G. SANKAR; J.M. THOMAS, "Bifunctional molecular sieve catalysts for the benign ammoximation of cyclohexanone: One-step, solvent-free production of oxime and s-caprolactam with a mixture of air and ammonia", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, doi:doi:10.1021/ja011001+, pages 8153 - 8154, XP002488749 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja011001+ | - NATURE, (200510), vol. 437, page 1243 | - J.M. THOMAS; R. RAJA, "Catalytically active centres in porous oxides: design and performance of highly selective new catalysts", CHEM. COMM., (2001), pages 675 - 687 | - J.M THOMAS; R. RAJA, "Design of a green one-step catalytic production of c-caprolactam (precursor of nylon-6)", PNAS, vol. 102, no. 39, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.0506907102, pages 13732 - 13736, XP002574721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0506907102 | - PNAS, vol. 102, no. 39, pages 13732 - 13736 | - K WEISSERMEL; H. J. ARPE, INDUSTRIAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1978), page 255 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, pages 8153 - 4 | WO2008GB02286 |