EP2521815 - PLANTABLE SOUND INSULATING ELEMENT AND SOUND INSULATING WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/46] | SOUND INSULATING ELEMENT AND SOUND INSULATING WALL | ||
[2016/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. Kohlhauer GmbH Draisstrasse 2 76571 Gaggenau / DE | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUCHTNER, Christian Blumenstrasse 13 76473 Iffezheim / DE | 02 /
KOHLHAUER, Reinhard Nelkenstr. 3a 76571 Gaggenau / DE | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/43] |
Former [2012/46] | Witte, Weller & Partner Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10700941.7 | 08.01.2010 | [2016/43] | WO2010EP00060 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082717 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521815 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521815 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
E01F8/0023 (EP);
E01F8/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEGRÜNBARES LÄRMSCHUTZELEMENT UND LÄRMSCHUTZWAND | [2016/15] | English: | PLANTABLE SOUND INSULATING ELEMENT AND SOUND INSULATING WALL | [2016/15] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ANTIBRUIT VÉGÉTAL ET PAROI ANTIBRUIT | [2016/15] |
Former [2012/46] | LÄRMSCHUTZELEMENT UND LÄRMSCHUTZWAND | ||
Former [2012/46] | SOUND INSULATING ELEMENT AND SOUND INSULATING WALL | ||
Former [2012/46] | ÉLÉMENT ANTIBRUIT ET PAROI ANTIBRUIT | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2010 | CY | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | MT | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | IE | 08.01.2017 | LU | 08.01.2017 | BG | 26.01.2017 | GB | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.01.2010 | |
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.01.2010 | |
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
GB | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 26.10.2016 | |
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 26.10.2016 | |
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5467567 (CHRISTENSEN STEPHEN M [US]) [X] 1-5,7,12,13,25 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 40; figure - * [Y] 9 [I] 6,8,10,14,15,20-24; | [X]US4143495 (HINTZ ULRICH) [X] 1,11,16-19,25 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 5; figure - *; | [X]FR2551784 (ALCOA NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [X] 1,11,25 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9311806U (KOCH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 4, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 2; figure . * | by applicant | EP1455018 | DE29510861U |