EP2394082 - MANUAL OVERRIDE APPARATUS FOR LINEAR ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher Controls International LLC 205 South Center St. Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GETHMANN, Douglas, Paul 1423 200th Street Gladbrook IA 50635 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10701284.1 | 19.01.2010 | WO2010US21392 | Priority number, date | US20090365663 | 04.02.2009 Original published format: US 365663 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090816 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394082 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394082 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/50 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
F16K31/508 (EP,US);
F16K31/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANUELLE ÜBERSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LINEARSTELLGLIEDER | [2011/50] | English: | MANUAL OVERRIDE APPARATUS FOR LINEAR ACTUATORS | [2011/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRIORITÉ MANUELLE POUR ACTIONNEURS LINÉAIRES | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | IE | 19.01.2013 | LU | 19.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0655574 (PYROMECA [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 48 - column 11, line 13; figure - *; | [A]EP1793114 (BEHR THERMOT TRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0094]; figure - *; | [A]US2008149874 (FUKANO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0089]; figure - * |