EP2396326 - SPIROINDOLINONE PYRIDINE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Li Dongjiao State Guest Hotel A18 No. 1800 Jinke Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Xingchun Lane 631, Gumeixi Road Rm 502, No. 201 Shanghai 201102 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Song 1155 Guanglan Road Pudong Shanghai 201210 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Zhuming 59 Wesley Road Hillsborough New Jersey 08844 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Beyermann, Jochen Carl F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG CLP - Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2011/51] | Application number, filing date | 10701882.2 | 02.02.2010 | WO2010EP51252 | Priority number, date | US20090151279P | 10.02.2009 Original published format: US 151279 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091979 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396326 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, A61K31/496, A61P35/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/438 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | SPIROINDOLINON-PYRIDIN-DERIVATE | [2011/51] | English: | SPIROINDOLINONE PYRIDINE DERIVATIVE | [2011/51] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE SPIROINDOLINONE ET DE PYRIDINE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 28.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2007213341 (CHEN LI [CN], et al) [AD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] *; | [A]WO2008055812 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-8* page 1, line 1 - line 10; claim 1 *; | [A] - DING KE ET AL, "Structure-based design of potent non-peptide MDM2 inhibitors", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, USA, vol. 127, no. 29, ISSN 0002-7863, (20050727), pages 10130 - 10131, (20050630), XP002527584 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA051147Z | by applicant | US2007213341 | - J. AM CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, page 10130 | - ANSEL ET AL., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms and Drug Delivery Systems, (1995), pages 196,456 - 457 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1999), page 11021 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), page 2617 | - GREENE, T.W. ET AL., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS INC. |