EP2387529 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PASSIVE PURGING OF MICRO-PERFORATED AERODYNAMIC SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWELL, Arthur G. 7271 Toulouse Drive Appt. 1 Huntington Beach, California 92647 / US | 02 /
VIJGEN, Paul M. 4918 23rd Avenue W. Everett, Washington 98203 / US | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/47] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10701964.8 | 18.01.2010 | WO2010US21331 | Priority number, date | US20090356018 | 19.01.2009 Original published format: US 356018 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010083494 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2387529 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2387529 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B64C21/08 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B64C21/025 (EP,US);
B64C21/08 (EP,US);
B64C2230/22 (EP,US);
B64F5/30 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | B64C21/06, B64F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PASSIVEN REINIGUNG VON MIKROPERFORIERTEN AERODYNAMISCHEN FLÄCHEN | [2011/47] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PASSIVE PURGING OF MICRO-PERFORATED AERODYNAMIC SURFACES | [2011/47] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURGE PASSIVE DE SURFACES AÉRODYNAMIQUES MICRO-PERFORÉES | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 08.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2010 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | SM | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.01.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1829616 (STALKER EDWARD A) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 99 - line 121; figures 5-8 *; | [Y]US2646945 (PERRY JOHN A) [Y] 1,4,5,10* figures 5,6 *; | [YA]EP0532093 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 8, line 2 - line 3 * [A] 10; | [Y]US5899416 (MEISTER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,10-15 * column 4, line 1 - line 3 * * column 4, line 51 - line 56 * * column 5, line 9 - line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2002166923 (MUNOZ JULES RICARDO [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO03066430 (MARTINOV NORMAN P [US]) [Y] 1,8,10-15 * page 2, line 2 - line 5 *; | [YA]US2007221788 (MEISTER JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005]; figure 1 * [A] 10; | [Y]US2008099631 (PARIKH PRADIP G [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * |