EP2376315 - GAS GENERATOR FOR RESTRAINING DEVICE OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/42] | GAS GENERATOR FOR RESTRAINING DEVICE OF VEHICLE | ||
[2013/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/16] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Tomoharu c/o Daicel Chemical Industries Ltd. 805 Umaba Ibogawacho Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 671-1681 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Naoki c/o Daicel Chemical Industries Ltd. 805 Umaba Ibogawacho Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 671-1681 / JP | 03 /
FUKAWATASE, Osamu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
KURATA, Tomoko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
NONOYAMA, Yuki c/o TOYODA GOSEI CO. LTD. 1 Haruhinagahata Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 06 /
YAMADA, Tadashi c/o TOYODA GOSEI CO. LTD. 1 Haruhinagahata Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 07 /
OZAKI, Toru c/o TOYODA GOSEI CO. LTD. 1 Haruhinagahata Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8564 / JP | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10702923.3 | 14.01.2010 | WO2010JP50660 | Priority number, date | JP20090006742 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009006742 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010082680 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376315 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2376315 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/04 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
F42B3/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | B60R21/264 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASGENERATOR FÜR RÜCKHALTEEINRICHTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2013/44] | English: | GAS GENERATOR FOR RESTRAINING DEVICE OF A VEHICLE | [2013/44] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE GAZ POUR DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE VÉHICULE | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/42] | GASGENERATOR FÜR EINE HALTEVORRICHTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | ||
Former [2011/42] | GAS GENERATOR FOR RESTRAINING DEVICE OF VEHICLE | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2010 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | IE | 14.01.2015 | LU | 14.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.01.2010 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
IE | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6126197 (MUIR MARTIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure -; claim 6(d) *; | [A]DE10002799 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007095035 (QUIOC EDUARDO L [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AP]FR2922007 (LIVBAG SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIF [FR]) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [AP]DE102007033344 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE]) [AP] 1-4 * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0039]; figure - * | by applicant | US5458371 | US6142515 | JP2005053382 |