01.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
30.03.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
21.03.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.09.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
02.09.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2016 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2016 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
21.04.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
11.04.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - English title |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
18.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
18.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
27.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|