EP2392135 - SIGNAL DIVIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technetix Group Limited Communications House Edward Way Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TZ / GB | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIJSSEMUS, Martien Technetix B.V. De Smalle Zijde 12 NL-3903 LP Veenendaal / NL | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Forsyth, Helen Jane, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Forsyth, Helen Jane, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge, CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 10703336.7 | 28.01.2010 | WO2010GB50129 | Priority number, date | US20090206670P | 02.02.2009 Original published format: US 206670 P | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086656 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392135 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H04L12/28, H03H7/48 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H04N7/104 (EP,GB,US);
H03H7/485 (GB);
H03H7/48 (EP,US);
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L12/2838 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SIGNALTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/49] | English: | SIGNAL DIVIDING DEVICE | [2011/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIVISION DE SIGNAUX | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5006822 (REDDY PRABHAKARA [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 21 - line 42; figure 3 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]US3673517 (TICKNOR SERGEI L) [X] 1 * column 5, line 21 - line 39; figure 5 * [I] 2-9; | [A]US6622304 (CARHART THOMAS W [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 14 - line 32 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 2; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2002166124 (GURANTZ ITZHAK [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0041] *; | [A]WO2004023729 (TIARIS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0025]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 2B *; | [A]US2005289632 (BROOKS PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0088] *; | [A]US2007039035 (MAGIN GREGORY A [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2002186096 (ZHENG WEI PING [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5006822 |