EP2385821 - IMPROVED PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egis Gyógyszergyár Zrt. Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Egis Gyógyszergyár Nyilvánosan Müködö Részvénytársaság Keresztúri út 30-38 1106 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKULASIK, Endre Kossuth Lajos u. 47 H-9783 Egyházasrádóc / HU | 02 /
SZAKALY, Péter Rákóczi út 81 H-9900 Körmend / HU | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/46] | 01 /
MIKULASIK, Endre Kossuth u. 60 H-8924 Nemespáti / HU | ||
02 /
SZAKALY, Péter Rákóczi út 81 H-9900 Körmend / HU | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2016/35] |
Former [2013/15] | Stolmár & Partner, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Motsch, Andreas, et al Motsch & Seitz Patentanwälte St.-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 10703346.6 | 08.01.2010 | [2016/35] | WO2010HU00003 | Priority number, date | HU20090000010 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: HU 0900010 | HU20100000006 | 07.01.2010 Original published format: HU 1000006 | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079373 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2385821 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2385821 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/02, A61K47/10, A61K31/4174 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61K9/02 (EP);
A61K31/4164 (EP);
A61K31/4174 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/46] | A61K9/02, A61K31/4164 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | AL | 08.08.2011 | BA | 08.08.2011 | RS | 08.08.2011 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG | [2011/46] | English: | IMPROVED PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION | [2011/46] | French: | FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2011/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2012/41] | 01.02.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2012/51] | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2012/51] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | GB | 08.01.2017 | IE | 08.01.2017 | LU | 08.01.2017 | MT | 08.01.2017 | HU | 09.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
MT | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
MT | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
MT | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
MT | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
HU | 09.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0271882 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * example 1 * [A] 2; | [XA]US4853211 (KUROBE TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * examples 1,4 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 2; | [A]EP0404376 (CURATEK PHARMACEUTICALS [US]) [A] 1-9 * example 8 * * claims 1,4 *; | [XA]WO9700670 (BIOGLAN AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * examples 2,7 * [A] 2; | [A]EP0770384 (MONTEFARMACO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * example 4 *; | [XA]US2005276836 (WILSON MICHELLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * example 3 * * claims 1,5,6 * [A] 2; | [A]WO2007079389 (DRUGTECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XA] - PHILLIPS A J, "Treatment of non-albicans Candida vaginitis with amphotericin B vaginal suppositories", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, MOSBY, ST LOUIS, MO, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.AJOG.2005.03.034, (20050601), vol. 192, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9378, pages 2009 - 2012, XP004937211 [X] 1,3-9 * page 2010, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2005.03.034 | by applicant | US4853211 | WO9700670 | US2005276836 | - PHILLIPS A. J., AM. J. OBSTA & GYNEC., (2005), vol. 192, no. 6, pages 200 - 2012 |