EP2401222 - LOOP FOR LIFTING LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/01] | ROUND SLING FOR RAISING LOADS | ||
[2013/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spanset Inter AG Samstagernstrasse 45 8832 Wollerau / CH | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOHSE, Lars Oberforstbacher Straße 245 52076 Aachen / DE | 02 /
GLASEN, Werner Kirchstraße 146 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704568.4 | 18.02.2010 | WO2010EP52061 | Priority number, date | DE20091010680 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009010680 | [2012/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097328 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401222 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401222 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/12, D07B1/18, B65D63/10, D07B7/16 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
B66C1/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65D63/10 (KR);
B66C1/18 (KR);
D07B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
D07B1/18 (KR);
D07B7/16 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUNDSCHLINGE ZUM HEBEN VON LASTEN | [2012/01] | English: | LOOP FOR LIFTING LOADS | [2013/52] | French: | SINGLE DE LEVAGE DE CHARGES | [2013/52] |
Former [2012/01] | ROUND SLING FOR RAISING LOADS | ||
Former [2012/01] | ÉLINGUE DESTINÉE À SOULEVER DES CHARGES | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2010 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | AT | 18.02.2015 | IE | 18.02.2015 | LU | 18.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.02.2010 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 18.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | DK | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004255568 (SHIH YU LIANG [TW]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0281287 (LASSILA & TIKANOJA OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008044855 (GORYO E N G [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0281287 | DE202007001484U |