EP2394361 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR TUNING DEVICES HAVING MECHANICAL RESONATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sand 9, Inc. 8 St. Mary's Street Room 628 Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REBEL, Reimund 78 Fieldstone Drive Ringwood NJ 07456 / US | 02 /
SCHOEPF, Klaus, Juergen 39 Custer Drive Ringwood NJ 07456 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704615.3 | 03.02.2010 | WO2010US00301 | Priority number, date | US20090149815P | 04.02.2009 Original published format: US 149815 P | US20090184138P | 04.06.2009 Original published format: US 184138 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010090731 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2394361 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/24, H03H9/25, H03H9/17, H03B5/30 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
H03B5/30 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (US);
H03H9/17 (EP,US);
H03H9/2426 (EP,US);
H03H9/25 (EP,US);
H03H2009/02204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ABSTIMMEN VON EINRICHTUNGEN, DIE MECHANISCHE RESONATOREN AUFWEISEN | [2011/50] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR TUNING DEVICES HAVING MECHANICAL RESONATORS | [2011/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR ACCORDER DES DISPOSITIFS AYANT DES RÉSONATEURS MÉCANIQUES | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP0375360 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,20,23,24,30,32,33 * column 6, line 3 - line 29; figure 1 * [A] 16-19,38-48 [I] 2,4,6,7,10-15,21,22,31,34-37; | [XAI]US5416447 (ANDRES DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,9,20,23,30,32,33 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 * [A] 16-19,38-48 [I] 2-8,10-15,21,22,24,31,34-37; | [A]US2002158700 (NEMOTO KENJI [JP]) [A] 10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2003034852 (KOBAYASHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,20,21,23,24,30,32,33 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073]; figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0092]; figures 9,10 * [I] 7,9-19,22,31,34-48; | [XI]US2004056728 (DENT PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1-9,20,21,23,24,30,32,33,38,39,41,45 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figure 5A * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; figures 5B,5C * [I] 10-19,22,31,34-37,40,42-44,46-48; | [XAI]EP1505722 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,20,23,30,32,33 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0051]; figures 4-6 * [A] 16-19,38-48 [I] 2-15,21,22,24,31,34-37; | [XI] - DRISCOLL M M, "LINEAR FREQUENCY TUNING OF SAW RESONATORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/58.84276, (19910701), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 366 - 369, XP000216475 [X] 1,3,8,9,20,23,24,30,32,33 * the whole document * [I] 2,4-7,10-19,21,22,31,34-48 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.84276 | [XAI] - M. M. DRISCOLL; D. J. HEALEY, "Voltage-controlled crystal oscillators", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, USA, (197108), vol. ED-18, no. 8, doi:10.1109/T-ED.1971.17237, pages 528 - 535, XP002588771 [X] 30,32,33 * the whole document * [A] 1-24,38-48 [I] 31,34-37 | by applicant | WO2006083482 | US2009243747 |