EP2393782 - BENZOIC ACID (1-PHENYL-2-PYRIDIN-4-YL) ETHYL ESTERS AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? SM | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 Parma / IT | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMARI, Gabriele Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
ARMANI, Elisabetta Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 03 /
DELCANALE, Maurizio Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10704746.6 | 04.02.2010 | WO2010EP00676 | Priority number, date | EP20090001660 | 06.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09001660 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089107 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393782 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393782 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D213/89, A61K31/44, A61P11/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,KR,US);
A61M15/0065 (US);
A61K31/4704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61M16/14 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | 01.08.2011 | BA | 01.08.2011 | RS | 01.08.2011 | Title | German: | BENZOESÄURE(1-PHENYL-2-PYRIDIN-4-YL)ETHYLESTER ALS PHOSPHODIESTERASE-INHIBITOREN | [2011/50] | English: | BENZOIC ACID (1-PHENYL-2-PYRIDIN-4-YL) ETHYL ESTERS AS PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS | [2011/50] | French: | ESTERS (1-PHÉNYL-2-PYRIDIN-4-YL) ÉTHYLIQUES D'ACIDE BENZOÏQUE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PHOSPHODIESTÉRASE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 24.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 12.09.2012 | [2015/24] |
Former [2014/09] | deleted | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9501338 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * Disclosure of Roflumilast (i.e. N-(3,5-dichloropyridin-4-yl)-3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-benzamide:; page 15; example 5; claim 24 * * Use as PDE4-inhibitor:; page 22, line 12 *; | [A]WO2008006509 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-18 * Disclosure of 3,4-Dimethoxy-benzoic acid (Z)-2-(3,5-dichloropyridin-4-yl)-1-(3,4-dimethoxy-phenyl)-vinyl ester and 3.cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-benzoic acid (Z)-2-(3,5-dichloropyridin-4-yl)-1-(3,4-dimethoxy-phenyl)-vinyl ester:; page 16; claims 18-20; compounds CHF5472, CHF5514 * * Use as PDE4 inhibitor:;; claim 18 * * Use in therapy of asthma and COPD;; claim 20 *; | [IP]WO2009018909 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [IP] 1-18 * 3-Cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-benzoic acid 1-(3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-phenyl)-2-(3,5-dichloro-pyridin-4-yl)ethyl ester as unspecified stereoisomer:; pages 14,36; example 11 * * 3-Cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-benzoic acid 1-(3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy-phenyl)-2-(3,5-dichloro-1-oxy-pyridin-4-yl)ethyl ester as unspecified stereoisomer:; pages 15,38; example 14 * * 3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-methanesulfonylamino-benzoic acid 1-(3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy)-phenyl-2-(3,5-dichloro-1-oxy-pyridin-4-yl)ethyl ester as unspecified stereoisomer:; page 19; example 69 * * 1-(3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy)-phenyl-2-(3,5-dichloro-pyridin-4-yl)ethanol as intermediate:; page 32; example 2b; table 2 * * 1-(3-cyclopropylmethoxy-4-difluoromethoxy)-phenyl-2-(3,5-dichloro-1-oxy-pyridin-4-yl)ethanol; page 48; example 18; table 7 * * disclosure of combination with additional drugs:;; claim 16 * * disclosure of pharmaceutical compositions:;; claims 14-16 * * the compounds as medicaments:;; claim 18 * * Use of compounds in treatment of asthma and COPD:;; claims 20-21 * * use in kits as e.g. nebulizers:; page 27, line 24 - line 28 * * use against dermatitis and rhinitis:; page 28, line 23 *; | [A] - ODINGO J O, "Inhibitors of PDE4: A review of recent patent literature", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, GB, (20050101), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 773 - 787, XP002413778 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.15.7.773 | by applicant | WO2008006509 | WO2009018909 | - JACOBITZ, S ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 50, pages 891 - 899 | - CORTIJO J ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL, (1993), vol. 108, pages 562 - 568 | - DUPLANTIER AJ ET AL., JMED CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, pages 120 - 125 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences Handbook, MACK PUB., vol. XVII | - HATZELMANN A ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2001), vol. 297, pages 267 - 279 | - DRAHEIM R ET AL., J PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2004), vol. 308, pages 555 - 563 | - DUPLANTIER AJ ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, pages 120 - 125 |