EP2393667 - PHOTO ALBUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/50] | PHOTOBOOK | ||
[2013/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer, Thomas In den Hofwiesen 19 72622 Nürtingen / DE | For all designated states Frech, Michael Kelterstr. 7 73240 Wendlingen / DE | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704749.0 | 06.02.2010 | WO2010EP00747 | Priority number, date | DE20091049593 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009049593 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011044960 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393667 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393667 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D3/12, B42D1/08 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B42D3/12 (EP);
B42D1/08 (EP);
B42P2201/02 (EP);
B42P2221/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | B42D3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CZ, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PL, SE, TR [2013/37] |
Former [2011/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOBUCH | [2011/50] | English: | PHOTO ALBUM | [2013/10] | French: | ALBUM | [2013/10] |
Former [2011/50] | PHOTOBOOK | ||
Former [2011/50] | ALBUM PHOTO | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2020/15] | TR | 18.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2386464 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 10-14 * abstract ** page 25, lines 1,2 *; | [XYI]EP1820661 (LEE CHANG-FA [TW]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0011] , [0012] * [Y] 3-6,10-14 [I] 9,15-17; | [Y]US2008016133 (TIEN KUANG-HSIA [US]) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * |