EP2406014 - ATOMIZATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINNAY, Thomas 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 02 /
FROEHLICH, Jens 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 03 /
KWOK, Kui-Chiu 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Depotstrasse 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10705031.2 | 08.02.2010 | WO2010US23471 | Priority number, date | US20090400146 | 09.03.2009 Original published format: US 400146 | US20090430809 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 430809 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104633 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406014 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/10, B41F7/30, B41F23/02, B41M1/06 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
B41F23/02 (EP,US);
B05B7/067 (EP,US);
B05B7/08 (EP,US);
B05B7/0815 (EP,US);
B05B7/0861 (EP,US);
B05B7/0884 (EP,US);
D21G1/0093 (EP,US);
D21G7/00 (EP,US);
B05B1/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/03] | English: | ATOMIZATION APPARATUS | [2012/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATOMISATION | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 04.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/32] | 31.03.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]AU462977B (MICRO-GEN EQUIPMENT CO.) [X] 1-20 * page 7 - page 9; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y]GB2073666 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP) [Y] 1-20* page 1, line 98 - page 2, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0048742 (HONEYWELL MEASUREX DEVRON INC [CA]) [Y] 1-20 * page 6, line 28 - page 17, line 9; figures 1-14 * |