EP2398330 - FROZEN DOUGH COMPRISING SACCHAROMYCES BAYANUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bakery Supplies Europe Holding B.V. Nienoord 13 1112 XE Diemen / NL | [2014/03] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states CSM Nederland B.V. Nienoord 13 1112 XE Diemen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Feng 13121 W 137th Place Overland Park KS 66221 / US | 02 /
YU, Weizhu 56 Whitewood Drive Morris plains New Jersey NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
WEILERT, Jesse 231 East 2300 Road Edgerton Kansas KS 66021 / US | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/52] | Raukema, Age Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 10705203.7 | 18.02.2010 | WO2010NL50081 | Priority number, date | US20090154086P | 20.02.2009 Original published format: US 154086 P | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010095939 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398330 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A21D6/00, A21D8/04 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
A21D6/001 (EP,US);
A21D8/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | GEFRIERTEIG MIT SACCHAROMYCES BAYANUS | [2011/52] | English: | FROZEN DOUGH COMPRISING SACCHAROMYCES BAYANUS | [2011/52] | French: | PÂTE SURGELÉE COMPRENANT SACCHAROMYCES SABAYANUS | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 16.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005266119 (LONERGAN DENNIS A [US]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2006078650 (BECHTOLD ROY A [US], et al) [A] 13-17* paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0060] - [0064] - [0068] - [0070] *; | [XI]WO2006133939 (MAURI TECHNOLOGY PTY LTD AB [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 8 * * page 12, line 24 - line 27 * * claims 1,3,4,5 * [I] 8; | [XDI]WO2007117145 (CSM NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-7,9-13,16 * page 4, line 19 - line 25 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 6 * * page 8, line 5 - line 14 * * claims 1-11 * [I] 14,15,17 | by applicant | US4406911 | US5447738 | WO2007117145 |