EP2405887 - A COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR SKIN LIGHTENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC a company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41424 Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment, London Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC a company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41424 Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2012/03] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC a company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41424 Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADGIL, Vijay Ramachandra Hindustan Unilever Limited Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 02 /
PANDEY, Parul Hindustan Unilever Limited Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 03 /
SURENDRA, Nagalakshmi Hindustan Unilever Limited Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 04 /
VELAYUDHAN NAIR, Gopa Kumar Hindustan Unilever Limited Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 05 /
VORA, Shilpa Atul Hindustan Unilever Limited Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield P.O. Bangalore 560 066 / IN | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever NV Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 10705583.2 | 18.02.2010 | WO2010EP52037 | Priority number, date | IN2009MUM0509 | 09.03.2009 Original published format: IN MU05092009 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010102888 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405887 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2405887 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/36, A61K8/81, A61Q19/02 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/36 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE HAUTAUFHELLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/03] | English: | A COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR SKIN LIGHTENING | [2012/03] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE POUR ÉCLAIRCIR LA PEAU | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2010 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | SM | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | IE | 18.02.2013 | LU | 18.02.2013 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.02.2010 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
LU | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 18.02.2013 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0345082 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP], et al) [AD] 1-8 * page 2, lines 9-11 * * page 3, lines 3-8, 14-24 * * Experiment 2-(1), 4-(1), 4-(2) * * tables 3, 7, 8 * * examples 4, 9, 14, 19 *; | [X]GB2134784 (OREAL) [X] 1-3 * example 18 *; | [X]EP0390456 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,4 * examples 1, 2 *; | [X]WO9114759 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 14, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]FR2897268 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1316306 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0345082 |