EP2401626 - IR DETECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SELEX ES LTD Christopher Martin Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Selex Galileo Limited Christopher Martin Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNE, Peter c/o Selex Sensors and Airborne Systems Limited Christopher Martin Road Basildon Essex SS14 3EL / GB | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor, et al SELEX GALILEO LIMITED c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park, Brook Lane, Tavistock Devon PL19 9DP / GB | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/27] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/01] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10705864.6 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010EP52291 | Priority number, date | GB20090003091 | 24.02.2009 Original published format: GB 0903091 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097390 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401626 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401626 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/781, F41G3/14, G01S3/784 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G01S3/784 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (US);
H04N25/767 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IR-DETEKTORSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/01] | English: | IR DETECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2012/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'INFRAROUGES | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | AT | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | SM | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6137566 (LEONARD DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,7,15 * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 30; figures 2,3,10,11 * * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 38 * [A] 11; | [X]US2006021498 (MOROZ STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,7,15* paragraphs [0024] , [0048] - [0055] - [0060] - [0062]; figures 5,9 *; | [X]US2006180746 (MUENTER STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0046] - [0047] - [0053] , [0059]; figures 5,6,12 *; | [I]US2007034776 (WEBER JONATHAN L [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] - [0057] , [0060] - [0070]; figures 1,4,6,7,8 *; | [XI]US7397019 (BYARS JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 59; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 8,11 |