EP2394413 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DOWNLOAD RATE OF REAL-TIME STREAMING AS NEEDED BY MEDIA PLAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bytemobile, Inc. 2025 Stierlin Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELNYK, Miguel 2009 Melrose Drive Apt. A Champaign, Illinois 61820 / US | 02 /
KIDD, Robert 302 Sunrise Dr. Urbana Illinois 61802 / US | 03 /
PENNER, Andrew 928 Waterview Way Apt. K Champaign, Illinois 61822 / US | 04 /
TIDEMANN, Jeremy 311 S. Randolph St. Champaign Illinois 61820 / US | 05 /
BREG, Fabian 410 Gentian Street Savoy Illinois 61874 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10705936.2 | 03.02.2010 | WO2010US00302 | Priority number, date | US20090368260 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: US 368260 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090732 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394413 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04N7/26 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DER DOWNLOAD-RATE VON ECHTZEIT-STREAMING JE NACH BEDARF DURCH EINEN MEDIEN-PLAYER | [2011/50] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DOWNLOAD RATE OF REAL-TIME STREAMING AS NEEDED BY MEDIA PLAYER | [2011/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DÉBIT DE TÉLÉCHARGEMENT DE DIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA EN TEMPS RÉEL SELON LES BESOINS D'UN LECTEUR MULTIMÉDIA | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1294193 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [Y] 15,40 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 9 ** column 4, paragraph 18 - column 5, paragraph 20 *; | [XY]US2008195743 (BRUECK DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16-39 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 48 - page 5, paragraph 63 * * page 6, paragraph 81 * * page 8, paragraph 98 - paragraph 99 * * claims 1, 6 * [Y] 15,40 |