EP2396404 - RNAI BASED SELECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qiagen GmbH Qiagen Strasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Peter Am Milchbornsberg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Roth, Carla, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Roth, Carla, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Roth, Carla, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstraße 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10706141.8 | 09.02.2010 | WO2010EP00788 | Priority number, date | EP20090001883 | 11.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09001883 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091837 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396404 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396404 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N15/63, C12N15/64, C12N15/67 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C12N15/1079 (EP,US);
C12N15/1034 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N15/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHLSYSTEM AUF RNAI-BASIS | [2013/26] | English: | RNAI BASED SELECTION SYSTEM | [2011/51] | French: | Système de sélection à base d'ARNi | [2013/26] |
Former [2011/51] | SELEKTIONSSYSTEM AUF RNAI-BASIS | ||
Former [2011/51] | SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION FONDÉ SUR L'ARNI | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2010 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MK | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | SM | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 09.02.2014 | LU | 09.02.2014 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.02.2010 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.02.2010 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02079467 (UNIV KOEBENHAVN [DK], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-30 *; | [Y]WO2005123925 (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-44 *; | [A]WO2006063786 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005052167 (COBRA BIOLOG LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004111190 (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004020631 (OPTIGEN TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XY] - HON HUIMING ET AL, "bcl-X-L is critical for dendritic cell survival in vivo", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20041001), vol. 173, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4425 - 4432, XP002421386 [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 | [A] - HAHN ET AL, "An siRNA-based system for differential regulation of ectopic gene expression constructs", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070306), vol. 128, no. 4, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 762 - 769, XP005916237 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2006.12.015 | Examination | - HORST IBELGAUFTS, Gentechnologie von A bis Z, Studienausgabe, Weinheim, Ney York, Basel, Cambridge, VCH, (1993), ISBN 3-527-30008-2 | - Pühler; Regitz;Schmid, Lexikon Biochemie und Molekularbiologie, Stuttgart, New York, Georg Thieme Verlag, (2000), ISBN 3-13-116681-9 | by applicant | WO02079467 | WO2005123925 | WO2006063786 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), pages 4425 - 4432 | - SUBRAMANI ET AL., MOLCELL. BIOL., (1981), pages 854 - 864 | - OUMARD ET AL., CYTOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 50, pages 93 - 108 | - SORRELL ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (2005), vol. 23, pages 431 - 469 |