EP2403568 - NEEDLE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEALD, Michael 19 Queensway Maidenhead Bergshire SL67SG / GB | 02 /
EKMAN, Matthew 59 Ecton Avenue Macclesfield Cheshire SK101RD / GB | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
HEALD, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis UK London Road Crewe Holmes Chapel Cheshire CW4 8BE / GB | ||
02 /
EKMAN, Matthew 59 Ecton Avenue Macclesfield Cheshire SK101RD / GB | |||
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
HEALD, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis UK London Road Crewe Holmes Chapel Cheshire CW4 8BE / GB | ||
02 /
EKMAN, Matthew c/o Sanofi-Aventis UK London Road Crewe Holmes Chapel Cheshire CW4 8BE / GB | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 10706266.3 | 04.03.2010 | WO2010EP52788 | Priority number, date | EP20090003178 | 05.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09003178 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100243 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403568 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403568 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
A61M5/322 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | 05.10.2011 | BA | 05.10.2011 | ME | 05.10.2011 | RS | 05.10.2011 | Title | German: | NADELEINHEIT | [2012/02] | English: | NEEDLE UNIT | [2012/02] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'AIGUILLE | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/02] | UNITÉ D'AIGUILLE | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2010 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | IE | 04.03.2015 | LU | 04.03.2015 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.03.2010 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9819723 (SPECIALIZED HEALTH PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,14 * figures 85-90,102,103 * [Y] 10,12,13,15; | [X]US5971964 (DONALDSON NEIL [GB]) [X] 1,14* column 5, line 23 - line 56; figures 3-5 *; | [XY]US2003105430 (LAVI GILAD [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,14 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0137]; figure 14 * [Y] 10,12,13,15 |