EP2397010 - TRANSMISSION WITH COLLISION DETECTION AND MITIGATION FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDSON, Thomas, J. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WU, Xinzhou 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ying 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
TAVILDAR, Saurabh, R. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LI, Junyi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10706420.6 | 12.02.2010 | [2019/12] | WO2010US24030 | Priority number, date | US20090370092 | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 370092 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010093874 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397010 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397010 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W8/00, // H04W74/08 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W74/0825 (US);
H04W74/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | H04W72/02, H04W8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG MIT KOLLISIONSDETEKTION UND MINDERUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | [2011/51] | English: | TRANSMISSION WITH COLLISION DETECTION AND MITIGATION FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2011/51] | French: | TRANSMISSION AVEC DÉTECTION ET ATTÉNUATION DE COLLISION POUR COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2010 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.02.2010 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.03.2019 | |
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0854619 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 32-40 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-35 * * page 2, lines 2-51 * * page 5, lines 8-18 * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 35 *; | [Y]EP1170916 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 32-40 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] *; | [A]US2003203735 (ANDRUS DON N [US], et al) [A] 32-40 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]EP1605721 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 32-40 * paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]EP1710960 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-31 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0042] - [0049] *; | [Y]US2007230431 (DRIESEN BAS [NL], et al) [Y] 1-31 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 10 ] , [0024] *; | [A]US2008130770 (KHANDEKAR AAMOD [US], et al) [A] 32-40* abstract *; | [A]WO2009009537 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * paragraphs [0083] - [0084] *; | [A] - ANDRAS RACZ ET AL, "On the Impact of Inter-Cell Interference in LTE", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2008. IEEE GLOBECOM 2008. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081130), ISBN 978-1-4244-2324-8, pages 1 - 6, XP031370721 [A] 32-40 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0IVA] * | Examination | US2008039046 |