EP2377134 - HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRIC CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTICINO S.P.A. Viale Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | [2014/26] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Bticino S.p.A. Via Messina, 38 20154 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABRIZI, Fabrizio Via Cucchi 5 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2011/42] | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane 15 00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 10706763.9 | 12.01.2010 | WO2010IT00004 | Priority number, date | IT2009RM00009 | 12.01.2009 Original published format: IT RM20090009 | [2011/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079524 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2377134 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377134 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/54, H01H1/22, H01H73/04 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
H01H1/54 (EP);
H01H1/226 (EP);
H01H73/04 (EP);
H01H77/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSSCHUTZSCHALTER | [2014/25] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRIC CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2011/42] | French: | DISJONCTEUR À HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2014/25] |
Former [2011/42] | ELEKTRISCHER HOCHLEISTUNGS-SCHUTZSCHALTER | ||
Former [2011/42] | DISJONCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE PERFORMANT | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2010 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | IE | 12.01.2015 | LU | 12.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | GB | 12.02.2015 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.01.2010 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 12.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 12.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 12.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
GB | 12.02.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR1268047 (ELEKTRO APP WERKE VEB) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-19; | [X]GB1451958 (MTE COMPONENTS LT, et al) [X] 1-5* figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE2615726 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [Y] 6-12,18 * figure 2 *; | [XY]JPS603829 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-5,13-17,19 * figure 9 * [Y] 6-12,18 |