EP2394492 - SOUPLE MEMBRANE FOR MANUFACTURING OF ITEMS MADE OF COMPOUND MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/50] | FLEXIBLE MEMBRANE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PARTS MADE FROM COMPOSITE MATERIALS | ||
[2012/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université du Havre 25, rue Philippe Lebon Boite Postale 1123 F-76063 Le Havre Cedex / FR | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERET, Sébastien 28 rue Anfray F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
BREARD, Joël 2 avenue de la Marne F-14750 Saint Aubin sur Mer / FR | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10707072.4 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010FR00085 | Priority number, date | FR20090000550 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: FR 0900550 | [2011/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089479 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394492 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394492 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/02, B29C65/36 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
B29C35/0805 (EP,US);
B29C65/36 (KR);
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
H05B6/02 (KR);
H05B6/105 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0811 (EP,US);
B29C35/0272 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHE MEMBRAN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GÜTERN VERSEHEN MIT VERBUNDMATERIALIEN | [2012/47] | English: | SOUPLE MEMBRANE FOR MANUFACTURING OF ITEMS MADE OF COMPOUND MATERIALS | [2012/47] | French: | MEMBRANE SOUPLE POUR LA REALISATION DE PIECES EN MATERIAUX COMPOSITES | [2011/50] |
Former [2011/50] | FLEXIBLE MEMBRAN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEILEN AUS VERBUNDSTOFFMATERIALIEN | ||
Former [2011/50] | FLEXIBLE MEMBRANE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PARTS MADE FROM COMPOSITE MATERIALS | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2010 | AT | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MK | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | SM | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5530227 (MATSEN MARC R [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure 2 * | by applicant | FR2890588 | FR2882683 | FR2882682 |