EP2395865 - DEFORMABLE SAFETY HELMET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuji Sports Ltd 7f No Chung Chen Rd Section 1Shih Lin Taipei / TW | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINIEL, Rémi 14 chemin du wellingtonia CH-1180 RoIIe / CH | 02 /
KAAKE, Shaw Feng yang lu 588 building 6 room 901 CN-200041 Shanghai / CN | 03 /
CHENG-HUEI, Ku No98 Songhua Jiang Rd Da Gang Industrial City Ningbo Economie and Technical Development Zone CN-315800 Zhejiang / CN | 04 /
Zl PING, Xiang No98 Songhua Jiang Rd Da Gang Industrial City Ningbo Economie and Technical Development Zone CN-315800 Zhejiang / CN | 05 /
DAVIS, Roger 128 Weihai Lu CN-200041 Shanghai / CN | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10707090.6 | 11.02.2010 | WO2010FR00108 | Priority number, date | FR20090000674 | 13.02.2009 Original published format: FR 0900674 | [2011/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010092254 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395865 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2395865 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/14, A42B3/12 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A42B3/125 (EP,US);
A42B3/12 (US);
A42B3/14 (EP,US);
A42B3/145 (US);
A42B3/00 (US);
A42B3/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFORMBARER SICHERHEITSHELM | [2011/51] | English: | DEFORMABLE SAFETY HELMET | [2011/51] | French: | CASQUE DE PROTECTION DÉFORMABLE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2010 | AT | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | SM | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8804821U (PETER KUEPPER "CODEBA" GMBH & CO, 5600 WUPPERTAL, DE) [A] 1 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [AD]US6665884 (DEMPS JUSTIN R [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2904197 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3; figure 2 *; | [A]US5815847 (HOLDEN JR J DAVID [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US3465363 (RANEY DENNIS F) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10029374 (BUSEN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3; claim 1 * | by applicant | US6665884 |