17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
04.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
01.02.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
24.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
17.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
16.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.01.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
30.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|